WA SB5557 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing services provided by pharmacists.
Title
Addressing services provided by pharmacists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 237, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-26 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |