WA SB5556 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an enhanced retirement benefit for public employees' and teachers' retirement system plans 1.
Title
Providing an enhanced retirement benefit for public employees' and teachers' retirement system plans 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1484 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5556&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5556.pdf |