WA SB5548 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the uniform unregulated child custody transfer act.
Title
Concerning the uniform unregulated child custody transfer act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Chapter 88, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-23 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
26 | 33 | 370 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 33 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |