WA SB5546 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning proactively addressing wildfire risk by creating a forest health treatment assessment.
Title
Concerning proactively addressing wildfire risk by creating a forest health treatment assessment.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. John McCoy [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. John Braun [R] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 95, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2017-04-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-03-23 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |