WA SB5544 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the types of commercial driver waivers allowed for military veterans.
Title
Increasing the types of commercial driver waivers allowed for military veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Rules. |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on third reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-03 | House | TRAN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |