WA SB5540 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding opportunities to purchase health care coverage from out-of-state carriers.
Title
Expanding opportunities to purchase health care coverage from out-of-state carriers.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Nathan Schlicher [D] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] |
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-27 | House | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology. |
2014-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-20 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-20 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-04 | House | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |
2013-03-26 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-26 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:00 PM. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |