WA SB5538 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning postretirement employment in nursing positions for a state agency.
Title
Concerning postretirement employment in nursing positions for a state agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Senate | Effective date 4/14/2023. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 99, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 37 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 40 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |