WA SB5532 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
Pending: House Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
Pending: House Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning special education.
Title
Concerning special education.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-26 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:30 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |