WA SB5531 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the revised uniform unclaimed property act.
Title
Concerning the revised uniform unclaimed property act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2023. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 225, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee amendment |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-25 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
63 | 29 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 040 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 050 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 060 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 070 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 080 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 090 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 100 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 120 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 130 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 133 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 135 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 140 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 150 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 160 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 165 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 170 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 180 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 190 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 192 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 193 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 194 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 195 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 200 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 210 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 220 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 230 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 240 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 250 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 260 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 270 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 280 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 290 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 300 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 310 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 320 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 330 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 340 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 350 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 360 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 370 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 380 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 900 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 902 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 903 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 905 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 29 | 906 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |