WA SB5530 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the building for the arts program.
Title
Concerning the building for the arts program.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1647 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Subjects
ART AND ARTWORKS
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
MUSEUMS
NONPROFIT ORGANIZATIONS
PERFORMING ARTS AND PERFORMANCE FACILITIES
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
MUSEUMS
NONPROFIT ORGANIZATIONS
PERFORMING ARTS AND PERFORMANCE FACILITIES