WA SB5525 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning veterans' mental health services at institutions of higher education.
Title
Concerning veterans' mental health services at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-23 | House | HE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | HIE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1737 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.