WA SB5523 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the requirement that a process server disclose a social security number when registering. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Declaring that social security numbers of process servers are confidential and not disclosable except as required under federal law. )
Title
Removing the requirement that a process server disclose a social security number when registering. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Declaring that social security numbers of process servers are confidential and not disclosable except as required under federal law. )
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |