WA SB5519 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Replacing an inactive certificate status with an inactive license designation.
Title
Replacing an inactive certificate status with an inactive license designation.
Sponsors
Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] |
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022*. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Chapter 85, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-02 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | BFST - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1648 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-31 - Governor vetoed.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 04 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 370 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 04 | 430 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |