WA SB5519 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mosquito control districts.
Title
Concerning mosquito control districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 54, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-01-31 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on third reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1583 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.