WA SB5517 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning rail dependent uses for purposes of the growth management act and related development regulations.
Title
Concerning rail dependent uses for purposes of the growth management act and related development regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Effective date 10/19/2017. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 18, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-28 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2017-06-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 11; absent, 2; excused, 1. |
2017-06-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-06-27 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-06-27 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-06-16 | House | First reading, referred to Rules |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Returned to second reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1504 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-16 - Governor vetoed.