WA SB5513 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing tax exemption transparency and accountability.
Title
Increasing tax exemption transparency and accountability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1500 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.