WA SB5507 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a manufacturer of certain dialysate and dialysis devices used by home dialysis patients or a manufacturer's agent from the pharmacy practices act and legend drug act.
Title
Exempting a manufacturer of certain dialysate and dialysis devices used by home dialysis patients or a manufacturer's agent from the pharmacy practices act and legend drug act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1675 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Subjects
DRUGS
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
HEALTH CARE
MANUFACTURING AND TECHNOLOGY
PHARMACIES AND PHARMACISTS
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
HEALTH CARE
MANUFACTURING AND TECHNOLOGY
PHARMACIES AND PHARMACISTS
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 64 | 257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 41 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |