WA SB5499 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the filing of a special allegation of a nefarious drone enterprise.
Title
Allowing the filing of a special allegation of a nefarious drone enterprise.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Brian Dansel [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-02 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2015-03-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-20 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:00 PM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |