WA SB5492 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adding training on public works and prevailing wage requirements to responsible bidder criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding training on public works and prevailing wage requirements to responsible bidder criteria.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2018-01-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-17SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-15SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-15SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-15SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-15SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateDue to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.

Same As/Similar To

HB1673 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-23 - Effective date 7/1/2019**.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback