WA SB5487 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning small school district consolidation incentives for infrastructure enhancement and modernization.
Title
Concerning small school district consolidation incentives for infrastructure enhancement and modernization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 315 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 525 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |