WA SB5485 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Licensing of music therapists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing of music therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-04-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-02HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-06Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-06SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback