WA SB5471 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing insurance, generally.
Title
Addressing insurance, generally.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-20 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-20 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1638 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Business & Financial Services.