WA SB5469 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying limitations on the use of intermediate licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying limitations on the use of intermediate licenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-17 Effective date 7/26/2009.
2009-04-17 Chapter 125, 2009 Laws.
2009-04-17 Governor signed.
2009-04-13 Delivered to Governor.
2009-04-10 Speaker signed.
2009-04-09 President signed.
2009-04-08 Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2009-04-08 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2009-04-06 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2009-03-30 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2009-03-24 TR - Majority; do pass.
2009-03-24 TR - Executive action taken by committee.
2009-03-24 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2009-03-16 Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2009-03-04 First reading, referred to Transportation.
2009-03-02 Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2009-03-02 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2009-03-02 1st substitute bill substituted
2009-02-17 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2009-02-13 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2009-02-13 TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2009-02-11 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2009-02-03 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2009-01-22 First reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback