WA SB5465 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elevating road maintenance and preservation in transportation planning.
Title
Elevating road maintenance and preservation in transportation planning.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1137 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Code Citations
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5465&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5465.pdf |