WA SB5454 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing property tax relief to Washington citizens who lost their homes in the labor day fires. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Creating a property tax exemption for homes damaged by natural disasters. )
Title
Providing property tax relief to Washington citizens who lost their homes in the labor day fires. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Creating a property tax exemption for homes damaged by natural disasters. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 192, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |