WA SB5452 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning electric-assisted bicycles.
Title
Concerning electric-assisted bicycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 191, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-11 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-23 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |