WA SB5447 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the county population requirement in order for a county to lease space with an option to purchase.
Title
Changing the county population requirement in order for a county to lease space with an option to purchase.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-22 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1380 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5447&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5447.pdf |