WA SB5446 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning electronic prescriptions.
Title
Concerning electronic prescriptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5446&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5446.pdf |