WA SB5446 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain hospitals from certificate of need requirements for the addition of psychiatric beds until June 2019.
Title
Exempting certain hospitals from certificate of need requirements for the addition of psychiatric beds until June 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1547 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-05 - Effective date 5/5/2017.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5446&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5446.pdf |