WA SB5442 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding the permitted uses of surplus funds from boater education card fees to certain boating safety programs and activities.
Title
Concerning expanding the permitted uses of surplus funds from boater education card fees to certain boating safety programs and activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-05 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1604 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.