WA SB5442 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning eligibility criteria for the community economic revitalization board programs.
Title
Concerning eligibility criteria for the community economic revitalization board programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-07-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-07-02 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-05-14 | House | CB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-05-14 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 10:00 AM. |
2015-05-01 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2015-04-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2015-03-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-24 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |