WA SB5435 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding membership of the department of children, youth, and families oversight board to include two youth under the age of twenty-five.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding membership of the department of children, youth, and families oversight board to include two youth under the age of twenty-five.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2019-02-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-01-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-23SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback