WA SB5432 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning cybersecurity and data sharing in Washington state government.
Title
Concerning cybersecurity and data sharing in Washington state government.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Emily Randall [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by State Government & Tribal Relations (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by State Government & Tribal Relations (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 291, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-25 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-17 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:15 AM. |
2021-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 105 | 215 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |