WA SB5428 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the application of the state environmental policy act to temporary shelters and transitional encampments. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning the application of the state environmental policy act to temporary shelters and transitional encampments to provide clarity and predictability to jurisdictions about categorical exemptions for temporary shelters and transitional encampments.)
Title
Concerning the application of the state environmental policy act to temporary shelters and transitional encampments. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning the application of the state environmental policy act to temporary shelters and transitional encampments to provide clarity and predictability to jurisdictions about categorical exemptions for temporary shelters and transitional encampments.)
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-24 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | HLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |