WA SB5423 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing workplace bullying by making it an unfair practice to subject an employee to an abusive work environment.
Title
Addressing workplace bullying by making it an unfair practice to subject an employee to an abusive work environment.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 12:00 PM. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5423&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5423.pdf |