WA SB5420 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning data reporting requirements for hospitals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning data reporting requirements for hospitals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2021-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-22SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM.
2021-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-15SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-12SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-12SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7041New CodeSee Bill Text
7112New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5420&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5420.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5420-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5420-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5420%20SBA%20HLTC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5420%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5420%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5420%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5420%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124312&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28584&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124312&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28693&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback