WA SB5417 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the disclosure of information on flood insurance coverage.
Title
Requiring the disclosure of information on flood insurance coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-03-25 | Chapter 14, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2009-03-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-03-19 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-03-16 | President signed. | |
2009-03-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-03-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-12 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-10 | FII - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-10 | FII - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-10 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-03-09 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-18 | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1564 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.