WA SB5415 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington Indian health improvement act.
Title
Creating the Washington Indian health improvement act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 282, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 7. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1365 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.