WA SB5414 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a tax preference for data centers in counties with a certain population.
Title
Providing a tax preference for data centers in counties with a certain population.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1473 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM.