WA SB5408 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the homestead exemption.
Title
Concerning the homestead exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 5/12/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 290, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-04-16 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2021-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-16 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-19 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 13 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
6 | 13 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
6 | 13 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
6 | 13 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |