WA SB5406 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing compensation for tow truck operators for keeping the public roadways clear.
Title
Providing compensation for tow truck operators for keeping the public roadways clear.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 12:30 PM. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On motion, referred to Transportation. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:00 PM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |