WA SB5404 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the impacts of pinnipeds on populations of threatened southern resident orca prey.
Title
Addressing the impacts of pinnipeds on populations of threatened southern resident orca prey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |