WA SB5397 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Behavioral Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Improving access to behavioral health treatment in certified crisis facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving access to behavioral health treatment in certified crisis facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-02-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7105New CodeSee Bill Text
7105020Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7105750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7105755Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7124037Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7124045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7124490Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback