WA SB5395 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning use of state resources during periods where state employees are required to work from home.
Title
Concerning use of state resources during periods where state employees are required to work from home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by State Government & Tribal Relations (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | SGE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
Subjects
COMPUTERS
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT, OFFICE
PUBLIC EMPLOYMENT AND EMPLOYEES
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT, OFFICE
PUBLIC EMPLOYMENT AND EMPLOYEES