WA SB5395 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying exemptions relating to real estate appraisals.
Title
Modifying exemptions relating to real estate appraisals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-04-01 | House | SG - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1431 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-01 - Effective date 7/24/2015.