WA SB5393 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Including fish passage barrier removal projects that comply with the forest practices rules in the streamlined permit process provided in RCW 77.55.181.
Title
Including fish passage barrier removal projects that comply with the forest practices rules in the streamlined permit process provided in RCW 77.55.181.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules Green Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-29 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1275 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.