WA SB5389 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the practice of optometry.
Title
Concerning the practice of optometry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 400, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2023-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee amendment |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-29 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 9:00 AM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 53 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 54 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 54 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |