WA SB5382 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning off-duty employment of fish and wildlife officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning off-duty employment of fish and wildlife officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-03-10SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2023-02-22SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-02-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-02-09SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-02SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB1369 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
492New CodeSee Bill Text
7715New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5382&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5382.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5382-S.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5382-S%20AMS%20MACE%20S1793.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5382-S%20AMS%20KAUF%20S2166.2.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5382%20SBA%20LAW%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5382%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5382%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66299
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127912&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30634&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback