WA SB5377 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning developer control of homeowners' associations.
Title
Concerning developer control of homeowners' associations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-21 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-05 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-02 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-01 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-21 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |