WA SB5376 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting consumer data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting consumer data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HouseSenate Rules "X" file.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-04-15HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-09HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-09HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 5:30 PM.
2019-04-08HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-03HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-03HouseITED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-04-02HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-18SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-14SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-14SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Same As/Similar To

HB1854 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback